NC H343 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Ch. SL 2015-171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Ch. SL 2015-171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clayton/Wallace ETJ Areas
Title
Clayton/Wallace ETJ Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | Ch. SL 2015-171 | |
2015-07-30 | Ratified | |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015 |
2015-07-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-28 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |