NC H341 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Ch. SL 2015-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Ch. SL 2015-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled Substances/NBOMe & Other Drugs
Title
Controlled Substances/NBOMe & Other Drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-17 | Ch. SL 2015-162 | |
2015-07-17 | Signed by Gov. 7/17/2015 | |
2015-07-17 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2015 | |
2015-07-16 | Ratified | |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-25 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |