NC H337 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Forsyth Tech Repurpose of Funds
Title
Forsyth Tech Repurpose of Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-05-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S423 (Same As) 2013-03-27 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget