NC H336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Ch. SL 2019-29
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extend Suspension of Spencer Mountain

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Suspension of Spencer Mountain

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17 Ch. SL 2019-29
2019-06-17 Ratified
2019-06-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-13HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-06-13HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-06-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-12HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-06-12SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-06-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-11SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/11/2019
2019-06-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-05SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/10/2019
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-04SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-29SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HousePlaced On Cal For 04/15/2019
2019-04-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-13HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback