NC H334 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-23 - Ch. SL 2015-248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-23 - Ch. SL 2015-248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School & Other Education Laws Changes
Title
Charter School & Other Education Laws Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] | Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Rep. Paul Stam [R] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-23 | Ch. SL 2015-248 | |
2015-09-23 | Signed by Gov. 9/23/2015 | |
2015-09-17 | Pres. To Gov. 9/17/2015 | |
2015-09-16 | Ratified | |
2015-09-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-14 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/14/2015 |
2015-09-10 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/15/2015 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-08-04 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-08-04 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-08-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015 |
2015-07-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-28 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-23 | Engrossed | |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | Ref To Com On Education - K-12 |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |