NC H333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Local Option Sales Tax Flexibility
Title
Local Option Sales Tax Flexibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-14 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed |