NC H333 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt Official State Sport
Title
Adopt Official State Sport
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Barnhart [R] | Rep. Justin Burr [R] | Rep. Linda Johnson [R] | Rep. Grey Mills [R] |
Rep. William Owens [D] | Rep. Fred Steen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-05-05 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-28 | Postponed To 5/5/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-14 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-03-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S322 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - Ch. SL 2011-187