NC H324 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Partisan Bd. of Ed. Elections
Title
Partisan Bd. of Ed. Elections
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] |
Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Rep. Christopher Millis [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-24 | House | Ref To Com On Elections |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed |