NC H320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PUV Changes
Title
PUV Changes
Sponsors
Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Charles McGrady [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M6 Reconsider M11 Not Concur (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M6 Reconsider M11 Not Concur (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-95 | |
2018-06-25 | Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Ratified | |
2018-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-14 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | House | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2018-06-14 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-14 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-14 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-13 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |