NC H309 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-19 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-19 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Transportation Changes
Title
Various Transportation Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-18 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alternative Energy
Alternative Fueled Vehicles
Appointments
Authorities
Boards
Confirmation
Conservation
Contracts
Council Of State
Dmv
Fuels
General Assembly
Governor
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Inspections
Local Government
Membership
Motor Vehicles
Public
Public Officials
Rail Corridor Authority
Railroad Board
Railroads
Reports
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Shipping
Stem
Title Change
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Administrative Rules
Alternative Energy
Alternative Fueled Vehicles
Appointments
Authorities
Boards
Confirmation
Conservation
Contracts
Council Of State
Dmv
Fuels
General Assembly
Governor
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Inspections
Local Government
Membership
Motor Vehicles
Public
Public Officials
Rail Corridor Authority
Railroad Board
Railroads
Reports
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Shipping
Stem
Title Change
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
124 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
124 | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
124 | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 880 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 881 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 882 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 883 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 884 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 885 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 886 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 887 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 888 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 889 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 890 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 891 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 892 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 893 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 894 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 895 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |