NC H302 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeal Kannapolis Annexation
Title
Repeal Kannapolis Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Ch. SL 2013-217 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/03/2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed |