NC H301 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying Changes/Engineers/Surveyors Laws
Title
Clarifying Changes/Engineers/Surveyors Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Richard Catlin [R] | Rep. Christopher Millis [R] | Rep. Michael Hager [R] |
Rep. Dana Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Ch. SL 2013-98 | |
2013-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013 | |
2013-06-06 | Pres. To Gov. 6/6/2013 | |
2013-06-05 | Ratified | |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-03-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-20 | House | Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Business and Labor |
2013-03-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S281 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Ref To Com On Commerce