NC H30 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-25 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-25 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Jacksonville Occupancy Tax.
Title
Jacksonville Occupancy Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-02-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-03 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S80 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H30 |