NC H29 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Methamphetamine/Offense/Penalties
Title
Methamphetamine/Offense/Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-124 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2013 | |
2013-06-12 | Ratified | |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/20/2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-02-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Health and Human Services |
2013-02-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-02-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-02-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-01-31 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed |