NC H283 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DHHS Recommend Telemedicine Policy
Title
DHHS Recommend Telemedicine Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Ch. SL 2017-133 | |
2017-07-20 | Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance |
2017-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |