NC H283 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prevent Squatting in Foreclosed Real Property
Title
Prevent Squatting in Foreclosed Real Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Ch. SL 2016-26 | |
2016-06-22 | Signed by Gov. 6/22/2016 | |
2016-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2016 | |
2016-06-20 | Ratified | |
2016-06-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-16 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-14 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary IV |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S161 (Same As) 2015-06-19 - Ch. SL 2015-89