NC H277 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement Admin. Changes Act of 2015.-AB
Title
Retirement Admin. Changes Act of 2015.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - A1 Ross Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - A1 Ross Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Ch. SL 2015-164 | |
2015-07-23 | Signed by Gov. 7/23/2015 | |
2015-07-21 | Pres. To Gov. 7/21/2015 | |
2015-07-20 | Ratified | |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |