NC H256 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
2017 Appointments Bill
Title
2017 Appointments Bill
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 77 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Ch. SL 2017-75 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA2 |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub and S Amend |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/15/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-07 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |