NC H255 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Cornelius Annexation
Title
Cornelius Annexation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-07 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S6 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-70