NC H250 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Ch. SL 2024-43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Ch. SL 2024-43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Public Safety/Other Changes
Title
Public Safety/Other Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Ch. SL 2024-43 | |
2024-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2024 | |
2024-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2024 | |
2024-06-28 | Ratified | |
2024-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2024-06-27 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2024-06-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-27 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2024-06-26 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2024-06-26 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2024-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-13 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Airport Authorities
Airports
Appointments
Attorneys
Authorities
Aviation
Boards
Budgeting
Buildings
Buses
Cameras
Capital Spending
Chaptered
Chief Medical Examiner
Controlled Substances
Corporations
Councils
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Death & Dying
Dhhs
District Attorneys
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Dwi
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Eminent Domain
Halifax County
Homicide
Id Systems
Ignition Interlock Devices
Indigent Defense Comn.
Indigents
Investigations
Kindergarten
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Medical Examiners
Membership
Minorities
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Motor Vehicles
Ngos
Nonprofit
Northampton County
Occupations
Pilot Programs
Presented
Property
Property-local Government
Public
Public Defenders
Public Officials
Public Transportation
Ratified
Reporting
Roads & Highways
Sales & Conveyances
School Buildings & Property
Secondary Education
Sentencing
Smuggling & Trafficking
Title Change
Traffic Cameras
Traffic Control Devices
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Women
Airports
Appointments
Attorneys
Authorities
Aviation
Boards
Budgeting
Buildings
Buses
Cameras
Capital Spending
Chaptered
Chief Medical Examiner
Controlled Substances
Corporations
Councils
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Death & Dying
Dhhs
District Attorneys
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Dwi
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Eminent Domain
Halifax County
Homicide
Id Systems
Ignition Interlock Devices
Indigent Defense Comn.
Indigents
Investigations
Kindergarten
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Medical Examiners
Membership
Minorities
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Motor Vehicles
Ngos
Nonprofit
Northampton County
Occupations
Pilot Programs
Presented
Property
Property-local Government
Public
Public Defenders
Public Officials
Public Transportation
Ratified
Reporting
Roads & Highways
Sales & Conveyances
School Buildings & Property
Secondary Education
Sentencing
Smuggling & Trafficking
Title Change
Traffic Cameras
Traffic Control Devices
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 517 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
117 | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
117 | 3.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 382 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 385 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 389 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 17.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 179.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
65 | 43 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
65 | 43.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 90 | (n/a) | Citation Text |