NC H250 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-26 - Ch. SL 2013-359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-26 - Ch. SL 2013-359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School Enrollment & Charter Revisions
Title
Charter School Enrollment & Charter Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-16 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 68 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-16 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-09 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - A2 Starnes Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - A1 Michaux Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-16 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 68 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-16 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-09 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - A2 Starnes Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - A1 Michaux Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-26 | Ch. SL 2013-359 | |
2013-07-26 | Signed by Gov. 7/26/2013 | |
2013-07-18 | Pres. To Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-17 | Ratified | |
2013-07-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-07-16 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-07-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2013 |
2013-07-15 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2013 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-09 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-07-09 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2013-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013 |
2013-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-07-02 | Engrossed | |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-03-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-03-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-03-21 | House | Postponed To 03/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Ref To Com On Education |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |