NC H243 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificates Under Seal in Indigent Cases/Fee
Title
Certificates Under Seal in Indigent Cases/Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Ch. SL 2011-285 | |
2011-06-24 | Signed By Gov. 6/24/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-15 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Placed On Cal For 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-08 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |