NC H242 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Charter School Law Changes
Title
Various Charter School Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-79 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2016 | |
2016-06-28 | Ratified | |
2016-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-27 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2016 |
2016-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2016 |
2016-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-15 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-14 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/25/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-03-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-19 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2015-03-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Filed |