NC H239 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Calendar Flexibility/Johnston Co
Title
School Calendar Flexibility/Johnston Co
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Strickland [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] | Rep. Howard Penny [R] | Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] |
Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. Wesley Harris [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Calendar
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Johnston County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Calendar
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Johnston County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 174.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |