NC H233 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Application for a Convention of the States
Title
Application for a Convention of the States
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Third Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 62 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Third Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 62 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
C | V-2. | (n/a) | Citation Text |