NC H218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Broadcast NC House of Reps Sessions
Title
Broadcast NC House of Reps Sessions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A1 Floyd Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A2 Floyd Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A1 Floyd Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A2 Floyd Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2019-03-06 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/06/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |