NC H2071 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ch. Res 2010-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ch. Res 2010-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Myrna Miller
Title
Honor Myrna Miller
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Ch. Res 2010-14 | |
2010-06-23 | Ratified | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-01 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Filed |