NC H207 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mandatory Training Contributing to CEUs
Title
Mandatory Training Contributing to CEUs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/15/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Education
Education Administration
Employment
Government Employees
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Professional Education
Public
State Board Of
State Employees
Teachers
Education
Education Administration
Employment
Government Employees
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Professional Education
Public
State Board Of
State Employees
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 270.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text |