NC H206 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Sponsors of Pittman-Robertson Act
Title
Honor Sponsors of Pittman-Robertson Act
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] | Rep. Kenneth Waddell [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/27/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2013-03-05 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |