NC H205 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Abuse & Neglect Resources in Public Schools
Title
Abuse & Neglect Resources in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/25/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2021-03-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Child Abuse
Council Of State
Crimes
Curriculum
Education
Education Cabinet
Family Issues
Health Education
Minors
Public
Public Health
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Session Laws
Sex Offenses
State Board Of
Students
Supt. Of
Child Abuse
Council Of State
Crimes
Curriculum
Education
Education Cabinet
Family Issues
Health Education
Minors
Public
Public Health
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Session Laws
Sex Offenses
State Board Of
Students
Supt. Of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 218.75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 47 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116 | 239.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text |