NC H204 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Hertford County Occupancy Tax
Title
Hertford County Occupancy Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Authorities
Counties
County Commissioners
Hertford County
Hotels & Motels
Local
Local Government
Occupancy
Session Laws
Taxation
Taxes
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Counties
County Commissioners
Hertford County
Hotels & Motels
Local
Local Government
Occupancy
Session Laws
Taxation
Taxes
Tourism Development Authorities
Travel & Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 164.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 155 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text |