NC H196 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Ch. SL 2013-249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Ch. SL 2013-249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
WS/FC School Board Vacancies
Title
WS/FC School Board Vacancies
Sponsors
Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. Christopher Malone [R] |
Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Ch. SL 2013-249 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-22 | House | Serial Referral To Government Stricken |
2013-03-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Elections, if favorable, Government |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |