NC H163 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Orange County Local Disclosure Act Repeal
Title
Orange County Local Disclosure Act Repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Hackney [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-07-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-02-23 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-02-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S81 (Same As) 2011-03-31 - Ch. SL 2011-17