NC H162 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
City of Morganton/Charter Amendments
Title
City of Morganton/Charter Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S150 (Same As) 2021-08-10 - Ch. SL 2021-102
Subjects
Burke County
Charters
City Managers
Counties
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Morganton
Municipalities
Public Officials
Session Laws
Vacancies
Charters
City Managers
Counties
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Morganton
Municipalities
Public Officials
Session Laws
Vacancies