NC H162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Administrative Procedure Laws
Title
Amend Administrative Procedure Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Deb Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-03 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-08-03 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-08-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-08-03 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/02/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2017-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S16 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Ch. SL 2017-211