NC S16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Ch. SL 2017-211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Business Regulatory Reform Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulatory Reform Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-05 - House - Veto Override (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 79 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A8 Shepard Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A7 Millis Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A6 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A5 Bradford Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A4 Bell, J. Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A3 Bradford Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - A2 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - House - A1 Millis Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-05 Ch. SL 2017-211
2017-10-05HouseVeto Overridden
2017-10-05HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-10-05HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-10-05HousePlaced On Cal For 10/06/2017
2017-10-05HouseVeto Received From Senate
2017-10-05SenateVeto Overridden
2017-10-05SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-10-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-08-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-08-14 Vetoed 08/14/2017
2017-08-04 Pres. To Gov. 8/4/2017
2017-08-03 Ratified
2017-08-03SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-08-03SenateConf Report Adopted
2017-08-03HouseConf Report Adopted
2017-08-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-08-03HouseConf Com Reported
2017-08-03SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-08-03SenateConf Com Reported
2017-06-28HouseConf Com Appointed
2017-06-20SenateConf Com Appointed
2017-06-20SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2017-06-20SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/21/2017
2017-06-20SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2017-06-16HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-15HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-06-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A8
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A7
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A6
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A5
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A4
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A3
2017-06-15HouseAmend Failed A2
2017-06-15HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-14HousePlaced On Cal For 06/15/2017
2017-06-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-07HouseRe-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
2017-06-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-07HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2017-04-13HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2017-02-28HouseRef To Com On Judiciary III
2017-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-27HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2017-02-27SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-02-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-02-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-02-22SenateReptd Fav
2017-02-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-02-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-02-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-02-02SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-02-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-01-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-01-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H162 (Same As) 2017-08-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S16&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S16v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=8
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=623
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=624
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=625
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=626
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=627
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=628
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=629
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=630
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=631
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=291
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=914
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=531
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=559
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=948

Bill Comments

feedback