NC H161 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - Re-ref Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - Re-ref Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt State Cat
Title
Adopt State Cat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |