NC H156 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legal Notices/Require Internet Publication
Title
Legal Notices/Require Internet Publication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-31 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S129 (Same As) 2015-02-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate