NC H154 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Governments in State Health Plan
Title
Local Governments in State Health Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Ch. SL 2015-112 | |
2015-06-24 | Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015 | |
2015-06-23 | Pres. To Gov. 6/23/2015 | |
2015-06-22 | Ratified | |
2015-06-18 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-18 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-06-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2015 |
2015-06-17 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-06-17 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2015 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Ref to Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Same As) 2015-02-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate