NC H1514 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-523
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-523
Summary
IDF Changes/Research & Prod. Serv. Districts.
Title
IDF Changes/Research & Prod. Serv. Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. James Crawford [D] | Rep. Margaret Dickson [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Pryor Gibson [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-523 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-28 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-07-27 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-23 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-20 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1005 (Same As) 2009-03-26 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1514 |