NC H150 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Contracted Health Services
Title
School Contracted Health Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/15/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Children With Special Needs
Contracts
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Health Services
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Public
Secondary Education
Students
Children With Special Needs
Contracts
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Health Services
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Public
Secondary Education
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 111.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |