NC H15 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Educ. Software/SWD Tuition
Title
Educ. Software/SWD Tuition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - A3 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - A2 Holloway Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - A1 Brody Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - A3 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - A2 Holloway Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - A1 Brody Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-09-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-09-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-29 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2015-09-29 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-09-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-01-29 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2015-01-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |