NC H148 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Ch. SL 2015-125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance Required for Mopeds
Title
Insurance Required for Mopeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Ch. SL 2015-125 | |
2015-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2015 | |
2015-06-24 | Ratified | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2015 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2015-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Insurance |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |