NC H143 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ch. SL 2021-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Swain County Sheriff Vacancies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Swain County Sheriff Vacancies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Ch. SL 2021-141
2021-09-09 Ratified
2021-09-08HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-09-08HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-09-03HousePlaced On Cal For 09/08/2021
2021-09-03HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-09-01HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-09-01SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-08-31SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-31SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-30SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-17SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-20SenateRe-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-25SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-25HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-23HousePlaced On Cal For 03/24/2021
2021-03-23HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-03-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-16HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-25HouseRef to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1625.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H143
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H143v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H143v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H143v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H143v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H143v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52887/0/H143-PCS10533-CH-24
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H143-SMBV-12(e1)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H143-SMBV-17(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H143-SMCH-71(e1)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H143-SMCH-73(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/52

Bill Comments 750

feedback