NC H141 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Senior Center Funds.
Title
Senior Center Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-04 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-03-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S191 (Same As) 2012-07-03 - Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H141 |