NC H1398 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Summary
Determining Senior Resident Sup Ct Judge.
Title
Determining Senior Resident Sup Ct Judge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-23 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1398 |