NC H134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Filling Vacancy/Onslow County Board of Comm
Title
Filling Vacancy/Onslow County Board of Comm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Ch. SL 2019-102 | |
2019-07-10 | Ratified | |
2019-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-09 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2019-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-08 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |