NC H134 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-18 - Ch. SL 2011-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-18 - Ch. SL 2011-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comm. Colleges/Opt Out of Fed'l Loan Prog-2
Title
Comm. Colleges/Opt Out of Fed'l Loan Prog-2
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Not Concur\Sen. Amd.\1 (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 70 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Not Concur\Sen. Amd.\1 (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 70 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-18 | Ch. SL 2011-178 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-16 | Failed Concur In S Amend | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-06 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2011-06-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-03-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-21 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-02-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |