NC H1335 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Summary
Moratorium on EMC Rule Making.
Title
Moratorium on EMC Rule Making.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-29 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/28/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-21 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-12 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1335 |