NC H133 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Ch. SL 2014-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Ch. SL 2014-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charlotte Airport Commission Clarifications
Title
Charlotte Airport Commission Clarifications
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. George Graham [D] |
Rep. Susan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 75 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Ch. SL 2014-10 | |
2014-06-18 | Ratified | |
2014-06-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-17 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2014 |
2014-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-06-12 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-06-11 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-02 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2013-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S111 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-115